Hyman, Andrew Robert (CPSO#: 69130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
563 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1B5
Phone: (416) 551-7700
Fax: (647) 689-2012
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 York St. Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: 416-350-5900
Fax: 416-350-5927
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Hyman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hyman ( CPSO# 69130 )

Business Address:
563 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 551-7700

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maryland
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW ROBERT HYMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HYMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2000 to 30 Apr 2001
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999