Ibrahim, Abdulmajid Saleh (CPSO#: 72008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Surgical Centre
1st Floor
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-4922
Fax: (905) 721-6648
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ibrahim ( CPSO# 72008 )

Business Address:
Taunton Surgical Centre
1st Floor
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-4922

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULMAJID SALEH IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2001