Ibrahim, Khaled Mohamed Omar (CPSO#: 75982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Division of Internal Medicine
Unit 18
261 Martindale RD
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A2
Phone: (905) 3977766
Fax: (905) 3973424
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khaled Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ibrahim ( CPSO# 75982 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Division of Internal Medicine
261 Martindale Road
Unit 18
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A2
Phone Number: (905) 397-7766

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 21 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALED MOHAMED OMAR IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2008