Iliescu, Eduard Andrei (CPSO#: 62119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Burr Wing 3
Suite 3.041
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 1360
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eduard Iliescu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Iliescu ( CPSO# 62119 )

Business Address:
1065 Katharine Crescent
Kingston ON  K7P 2T9
Phone Number: (613) 384-3667

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Burr Wing 3
Suite 21.3.041
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-1360

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDUARD ANDREI ILIESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILIESCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1991

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: September 28, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Findings:

If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding of guilt to be posted on the register if the information is known to the College.
The following sets out finding(s) of guilt made against this member on or after June 1, 2015, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On September 19, 2018, Dr. Eduard Iliescu was found guilty of:

(a) operating a motor vehicle while impaired by alcohol contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code, and

(b) failing to stop at an accident contrary to Section 252(1.1) of the Criminal Code.

Dr. Iliescu was sentenced to imprisonment for 3 months to be served in the community if he obeys the conditions set out in the Conditional Sentence Order (see PDF), and probation for a further 9 months. He is also prohibited from operating a motor vehicle for a period of 12 months from September 19, 2018.
Download Full Document (PDF)