Ilkov-Moor, Snezana Susan (CPSO#: 75269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Continuing Care-
Mental Health Services
4-111 Industrial Blvd
Napanee ON  K7R 3Z1
Phone: (613) 354-3916
Fax: (613) 354-6673
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Ilkov-Moor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SNEZANA SUSAN ILKOV-MOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILKOV-MOOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 14 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 15 Sep 2004 to 14 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 15 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006