Ip, Andrew Pui-Lam (CPSO#: 79135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 May 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (905) 759-3434
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

210 Gran Street Unit C
Sault Ste Marie, Ontario
P6C 0C4
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6C 0C4
Canada
Phone: 705-575-7191
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Ip Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ip ( CPSO# 79135 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW PUI-LAM IP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2003