Iqbal, Tariq (CPSO#: 83103)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 20 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Oct 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tariq Iqbal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 20 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 14 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 25 Aug 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2014
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 20 Oct 2015

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Sep 2015
Summary:

 On September 24, 2015, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
 Ontario found that Dr. Iqbal committed acts of professional misconduct in that, in respect of four 
patients, he has engaged in sexual abuse, he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional and he has failed to maintain the 
standard of practice of the profession. 
 
Ms A 
Regarding Ms A, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal failed to maintain the standard of practice 
in respect of Ms A by failing to ensure her privacy (failing to leave the room while dressing and 
not ensuring appropriate draping) by performing examinations in the prone position; by 
performing intimate examinations that were unnecessary and in the manner he performed the 
 intimate examinations. 
  
 In addition, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal sexually abused Ms A during an office visit in 
 May 2011, by repeatedly and forcefully moving his finger(s) in and out of her rectum in a sexual 
 manner and without changing gloves, moved directly to insert his fingers in her vagina and again 
 moved them in and out in a sexual manner, under the guise of medical examinations. 
  
 Ms B 
 Regarding Ms B, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal failed to maintain the standard of practice 
 of the profession by failing to respect the privacy of Ms B (failing to leave the room while 
dressing and assisting undressing), and by performing an unjustified examination in an 
inappropriate manner. 
 
In addition, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal sexually abused Ms B by penetrating her vagina 
with his finger and moving it in a sexual manner. Further, while performing a cortisone injection, 
Dr. Iqbal sexually abused Ms B by having a finger in her vagina and massaging the area without 
medical justification. 
 
Ms C 
Regarding Ms C, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal failed to maintain the standard of practice 
of the profession by failing to respect Ms C’s privacy, assisting her in removing her clothing, the 
manner and position he performed a perianal examination, and by inappropriately touching her 
vagina and clitoris during the examination. 
 
In addition, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal sexually abused Ms C on the office visit of June 
2011 by touching her vagina and clitoris in a sexually stimulating manner under the guise of a 
medical examination.  
 
Ms D 
Regarding Ms D, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal failed to maintain the standard of practice 
of the profession in respect of Ms D by not respecting her privacy when he remained in the room 
while she changed, and by performing inappropriate examinations of her vagina. 
 
In addition, the Committee found Dr. Iqbal engaged in sexual abuse of Ms D in May 2011, by 
touching her lower vulva and separating her labia without clinical justification, and in June 2011, 
when he inserted his fingers into her rectum and vagina and moved them in a sexual manner 
under the guise of a medical examination.  
 
The Committee found that Dr. Iqbal’s conduct with respect to these four patients, Ms A, Ms B, 
Ms C, and Ms D, would also reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, 
or unprofessional. 
 
On October 20, 2015, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
-  the Registrar revoke Dr. Iqbal’s certificate of registration, effective immediately; 
-  Dr. Iqbal appear before the panel to be reprimanded on a date to be fixed by the hearings 
   office which shall be no later than six (6) months from the date this Order becomes final 
-  Dr. Iqbal reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required 
   under section 85.7 of the Code, and shall post an irrevocable letter of credit or other security 
   acceptable to the College to guarantee payment of such amounts within sixty (60) days of the 
   date this Order becomes final, in the amount of  $64,240.00 
-  Dr. Iqbal pay costs to the College in the amount of $49,060.00 within sixty (60) days of the 
   date this Order become final.  
 
On November 17, 2015, Dr. Iqbal appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the 
Divisional Court. In the circumstances of the case, the penalty remains in effect. 
 
On December 3, 2015, Dr. Iqbal abandoned the appeal of the decision of the Discipline 
Committee to the Divisional Court. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): May 19-22, June 1-5, June 16, 2015. Penalty hearing date: October 20, 2015