Irobi, Clara Chinyere (CPSO#: 81990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nigeria, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winchester District
Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420 Ext. 6765
Fax: (613) 774-6536
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Services,
University of Ottawa
100 Marie Curie
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Canada
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Kingsway Health Centre
5542 Ann Street, First Floor,
Ottawa ON  K4M 1A7
Canada
Phone: (613) 692-5433
Fax: (613) 692-5435
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. C. Irobi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Irobi ( CPSO# 81990 )

Business Address:
2 Gould Street
Smiths Falls ON  K1A 2S5
Phone Number: (613) 284-2558

Business Address:
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 772-6521

Business Address:
The Kingsway Health Centre
5542 Anne Street, First Floor
Manotick ON  K4M 1A7
Phone Number: (613) 692-5433

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Business Address:
Health Services
University of Ottawa
300 - 100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 564-4070

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLARA CHINYERE IROBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IROBI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 19 Oct 2004 to 10 Jan 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 11 Jan 2005 to 18 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 19 Oct 2005 to 18 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 19 Oct 2006 to 18 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 19 Oct 2007 to 19 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 17 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2008 to 16 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2009 to 16 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2010 to 16 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2011 to 17 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)