Islam, Ali (CPSO#: 73527)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
St Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6035
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Islam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Islam ( CPSO# 73527 )

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Business Address:
43 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 1G6

Business Address:
39 - 2nd Street SE
Chesley ON  N0G 1L0

Business Address:
320 College Street
Durham ON  N0G 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 369-2340

Business Address:
90 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1
Phone Number: (519) 364-2340

Business Address:
Alexandra Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 485-1700

Business Address:
1609 Stittsville Main
Stittsville ON  K2S 1N5

Business Address:
230 First Avenue Suite 112
St Thomas ON  N5R 4P5
Phone Number: (519) 631-6437

Business Address:
268 Main Street
Lucan ON  N0M 2J0

Business Address:
857 Grand Avenue West
Suite 112
Chatham ON  N7L 4T1

Business Address:
433 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 1H2

Business Address:
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone Number: (519) 291-2813

Business Address:
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham ON  N9G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-3688

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6035

Business Address:
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 672-5270

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue
Chatham ON  N7L 2V7
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8689

Business Address:
South Bruce Grey Health Care
21 McGivern Street West
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Phone Number: (519) 881-1220

Business Address:
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3C9
Phone Number: (519) 245-1550

Business Address:
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y0
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Business Address:
24 Huron Street West
SS 2
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-2700

Business Address:
1824 Concession Drive
R R 3
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI ISLAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISLAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2005