Ivanova, Liudmila (CPSO#: 89982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tver State Medical Academy, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dundas Valley Medical Centre
107 King Street West, Suite 204
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone: (905) 627-3505
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

City of Hamilton Public Health
Sexual Health Program
100 Main St W, Hamilton, ON
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Liudmila Ivanova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ivanova ( CPSO# 89982 )

Business Address:
Dundas Valley Medical Centre
Suite 204
107 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone Number: (905) 627-3505

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIUDMILA IVANOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IVANOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2008 to 24 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Jan 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 13 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2012