Jablonowski, Karin Alexandra (CPSO#: 83490)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deron Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Cres S Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 Fax: 416-398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 17 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jul 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2017
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 14, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: April 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Karin Alexandra Jablonowski to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 17, 2017:

Dr. Jablonowski has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.