Jaeger, Valerie Anne (CPSO#: 56287)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 19 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Petrocci & Valerie Jaeger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Niagara Region Public Health PO Box 1052, Stn Main Thorold, ON L2V 0A2 Phone: 905-688-3762
Date Received: 12 Jul 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2018