Jaff, Zardasht Hasan (CPSO#: 90885)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Gaf, Zardasht Hasan (used until: 28 Apr 2010 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kurdi

Education:Hawler Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Cardiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3225
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z Jaff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Jaff ( CPSO# 90885 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Cardiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZARDASHT HASAN JAFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 10 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 11 Jan 2011 to 04 Apr 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 05 Apr 2011 to 10 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 11 Jul 2011 to 10 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 11 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2016 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014