Jahromi, Afshin (CPSO#: 73402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone: (519) 836-9441
Fax: (519) 836-1793
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Afshin Jahromi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jahromi ( CPSO# 73402 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone Number: (519) 836-9441

Business Address:
932 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G4
Phone Number: (519) 585-1116

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AFSHIN JAHROMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAHROMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005