Jain, Vipul (CPSO#: 97236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Region Medical
8279 Lundy's Lane
Unit A3/A4
Niagara Falls ON  L2H 1H5
Phone: (905) 357-1661
Fax: (905) 371-9090
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

35 Upper Centennial Pkwy
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Canada
Phone: 905-662-3885
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vipul Jain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Jain ( CPSO# 97236 )

Business Address:
Niagara Region Medical
8279 Lundy's Lane
Unit A3/A4
Niagara Falls ON  L2H 1H5
Phone Number: (905) 357-1661

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
2nd Floor
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 662-3885

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 15 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 13 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 12 Mar 2012 to 08 Apr 2012
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 22 Oct 2012 to 18 Nov 2012
Elective Trainee - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 06 May 2013 to 02 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Aug 2014 to 17 Sep 2014
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2016 to 06 Mar 2016
Elective Trainee - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2016 to 03 Apr 2016
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 04 Apr 2016 to 15 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

McMaster University, 16 May 2016 to 26 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Vipul Jain may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine and
            Clinical Immunology and Allergy, only.