Jakda, Ahmed Ibrahim (CPSO#: 88053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Oct 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Palliative Care
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4380
Fax: (519) 749-4208
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jakda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 10 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Apr 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Jun 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Ahmed Ibrahim Jakda may practise medicine independently in palliative care
            medicine, only.