Jamal, Dried Emad (CPSO#: 94735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SIDRA Medicine
PO Box 26999
Doha PO Box 26999
Qatar
Phone: +97440031016
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dried Jamal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jamal ( CPSO# 94735 )

Business Address:
The Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Qatar

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DRIED EMAD JAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2012