Jamensky, Neil Thomas (CPSO#: 74894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
The Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8208
Fax: (905) 889-6096
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamensky Rudnikoff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jamensky ( CPSO# 74894 )
Dr. J. Rudnikoff ( CPSO# 72185 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
The Scarborough Hospital
General Division
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8208

Business Address:
The Jacobs Pain Centre
102 - 8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Phone Number: (905) 305-9484

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL THOMAS JAMENSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMENSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005