James, Aisha Nyota Pia (CPSO#: 91306)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unison Health And
Community Services
1541 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M9N 2R3
Phone: (416) 645-7575
Fax: (416) 645-7570
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Life Clinic
101 Queensway
Suite 400
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Canada
Phone: 9053660053
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AISHA NYOTA PIA JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012