Janjua, Meer Mahmood Muneer (CPSO#: 96353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3B
191 Varsity Parade
Varsity Lakes 4227
Australia
Phone: +61 427 727 45
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meer Janjua Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Sep 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEER MAHMOOD MUNEER JANJUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANJUA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Jul 2011
Elective Trainee - Forensic Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2016