Jarmain, Sarah Helen (CPSO#: 66684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Care London
PO Box 5777 Stn B
London, ON
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47250
Fax: (519) 452-4392
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Parkwood Mental Health Care
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Canada
Phone: 519-455-5110 Ext. 48408
Fax: 519-452-4392
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

LHSC Victoria Hospital
Mental Health Care Program
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: 519-455-5110 Ext. 48408
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

294 Talbot Street, Unit 1
St Thomas ON  N5P 4E3
Canada
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 48408
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care,St Thomas Mental Health Site St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH HELEN JARMAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARMAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998