Peirovy, Javad (CPSO#: 84832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Apr 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Azari, English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ultimate Diagnostics
298 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M3N 3B1
Phone: (416) 223-6500
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Peirovy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Peirovy ( CPSO# 84832 )

Business Address:
298 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2N 3B1
Phone Number: (416) 223-6500

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 27 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 27 Apr 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 27 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 03 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 20 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 20 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            (1of 2) 
            As  from  12:01  a.m.,  May 20, 2018, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the  College  of  Physicians  and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed  on  the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Javad Peirovy:

            Practice Restrictions

            1.    Dr.  Peirovy  shall  not  delegate  controlled  acts (as defined  in  the
                  Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991), nor shall  he permit individuals
                  who are not regulated health professionals to conduct  assessments,  take
                  histories, or conduct physical examinations of patients.

            2.    Dr.  Peirovy  shall  not be the medical director of any medical office or
                  facility.

            Monitoring

            3.    Dr. Peirovy shall, within  five  (5)  days,  inform  the  College  of the
                  address  of  each  location in which he practises medicine (his "Practice
                  Location(s)") including  locations  in which he formerly acted as medical
                  director, and shall within seven (7)  days  of commencing practice at any
                  new Practice Location(s), advise the College of its address.

            4.    Dr. Peirovy shall provide his irrevocable consent  to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance  Plan, in order for
                  the College to monitor his compliance with the terms of this Order. 

            5.    Dr.   Peirovy  shall  cooperate  with  any  inspection  of  his  Practice
                  Location(s)  by  the  College, which may be made without notice and which
                  may include, but not be limited to, review of patient charts and/or other
                  records and interviews  of staff, in order to monitor his compliance with
                  this Order.

            (2of2)
            As from 11:59 p.m., May 3, 2018,  by  order  of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario  on April 27, 2016, the following
            terms,  conditions  and  limitations  are  imposed  on   the   certificate   of
            registration held by Dr. Javad Peirovy:

            Practice Monitor
            a)    Dr.  Peirovy  shall not engage in any professional encounters with female
                  patients of any  age  unless  the  patient  encounter  takes place in the
                  presence  of  a  monitor  who  is  a female member of a regulated  health
                  profession and who is acceptable to the College (the "Practice Monitor"),
                  to be reconsidered upon application to the Committee by Dr. Peirovy after
                  a  minimum  of  one  year  following his  return  to  practice  once  his
                  suspension has ended;

            b)    At all times, Dr. Peirovy shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall:
                  i.    Remain in the examination  room  or  consultation room at all times
                        during all professional encounters with  all  female patients, even
                        if another person is accompanying the patient; 
                  
                  ii.   Carefully observe all of his physical examinations  (including  but
                        not  limited  to  breast  and  chest  examinations)  of  all female
                        patients, with an unobstructed view of the examination;

                  iii.  Refrain from performing any other functions, except those  required
                        in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "A" (the
                        "Practice  Monitor's Undertaking"), while observing him in all  his
                        professional encounters with female patients;
                  
                  iv.   Keep a patient  log  in  the  form attached as Appendix "B" to this
                        Order of all the female patients  with  whom  Dr.  Peirovy  has  an
                        in-person professional encounter in the Practice Monitor's presence
                        (the "Log");
                  
                  v.    Initial  the  corresponding  entry  in  the records of each patient
                        noted in the Log to confirm that the Practice  Monitor  was  in the
                        presence  of  Dr. Peirovy at all times during each female in-person
                        professional encounter;
                  
                  vi.   Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis; and
                  
                  vii.  Provide  reports   (as   described   in   the   Practice  Monitor's
                        Undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis.

            c)    Dr. Peirovy shall maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and shall make
                  it available to the College upon request;

            Notification of Practice Locations 
            d)    Dr. Peirovy shall inform the College of each and every  location  that he
                  practices  including,  but  not  limited  to,  hospital(s), clinic(s) and
                  office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice Location(s)"),
                  within fifteen (15) days of this Order. Going forward,  he  shall  inform
                  the  College  of  any  and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15)
                  days of commencing practice at that location; 

            Posting a Sign 
            e)    Dr. Peirovy shall post a  sign  in  his  waiting  room(s) and each of his
                  examination and/or consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in
                  a  clearly visible and secure location, in the form  attached  hereto  as
                  Appendix "C"; 

            f)    r. Peirovy  shall  provide patients with a guide to access the Discipline
                  Committee's decision in this matter, if requested;

            Monitoring 
            g)    Dr. Peirovy shall consent  to the College making appropriate enquiries of
                  the Ontario Health Insurance  Plan  and/or  any person or institution who
                  may have relevant information in order for the  College  to  monitor  Dr.
                  Peirovy's compliance with the terms of this Order and shall promptly sign
                  such  consents  as may be necessary for the College to obtain information
                  from these persons or institutions;

            h)    Dr.  Peirovy  shall  submit  to,  and  not  interfere  with,  unannounced
                  inspections of  his  Practice  Locations  and  to  inspections of patient
                  charts  by  the  College  and  to  any other activity the  College  deems
                  necessary,  including  simulated  patients,   in  order  to  monitor  Dr.
                  Peirovy's compliance with the terms of this Order;

            i)    Dr.  Peirovy  shall  consent  to  the  College  providing   any  and  all
                  information  to the Practice Monitor that the College deems necessary  or
                  desirable in order  to  assist  the  Practice  Monitor  in fulfilling her
                  Undertaking  and  in order to monitor Dr. Peirovy's compliance  with  the
                  terms of this Order; and

            j)    Dr. Peirovy shall consent  to  all  Practice  Monitors  disclosing to the
                  College,  and  to  one another, any information relevant to  this  Order,
                  relevant  to the terms  of  the  Practice  Monitor's  Undertaking  and/or
                  relevant for  the  purposes  of  monitoring Dr. Peirovy's compliance with
                  this Order;

            Individualized Instruction 
            k)    Dr. Peirovy continue to undergo individualized  instruction with Dr. D on
                  issues  of  consent,  the maintenance of boundaries,  and  doctor/patient
                  communication, and that  Dr.  D  report  to  the College on Dr. Peirovy's
                  progress each six months, with a final report  to  follow  prior  to  her
                  termination   of   instruction  with  Dr.  Peirovy.  Termination  of  the
                  individualized instruction shall be at the discretion of Dr. D;

            Clinical Education Program
            l)    Dr. Peirovy shall, within  90  days of the commencement of the suspension
                  of his certificate of registration,  meet  with  a physician advisor from
                  the  College  to establish a clinical education program,  directed  by  a
                  supervisor acceptable  to  the  College,  regarding the issue of physical
                  examination, with particular focus on issues of the sexual privacy of and
                  sensitivity to female patients.

            m)    All the above terms and conditions to be at Dr. Peirovy's expense.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Feb 2018
Summary:

On February 26, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Javad Peirovy committed an act 
of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to 
the practice of medicine that, having regard to all of the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonorable, or unprofessional. 
 
Patient A  
 
Dr. Peirovy is a general practitioner, who was working in a walk-in clinic in 2009. Patient A, a 
single woman in her twenties, saw him for a minor ailment. She was assessed by Dr. Peirovy in a 
brief interview involving history and physical examination. During the examination, she partially 
lifted her shirt up while he palpated her abdomen but was otherwise fully clothed. Patient A and 
Dr. Peirovy shared a cultural background and language. At the end of the medical appointment, 
he gave her his cell phone number. When she left the appointment, Patient A expected that she 
and Dr. Peirovy would date. Nothing was said about dating or ending the doctor-patient 
relationship during the appointment. Patient A did not consider Dr. Peirovy her doctor after the 
appointment. 
 
Two days later Patient A called Dr. Peirovy, and over the ensuing two weeks, they telephoned 
each other often, before going on a date. They developed a one and a half year relationship that 
was characterized by mutual respect and consideration, though there were several breakups. The 
relationship included holding hands, hugging, kissing and physical sexual touching, but no 
intercourse. Patient A eventually broke off the relationship.  
 
At one point, Dr. Peirovy mentioned to Patient A his concern regarding how they first met, that 
is that it occurred during a medical encounter. He suggested he wanted her to sign a document 
because of his worry that the way they met was not right, was unethical. He did not follow 
through with this.  
 
Decision 
 
The Committee found that Dr. Peirovy engaged in conduct relevant to practice of medicine that, 
having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional, by using his medical office to initiate a social relationship with 
a young female patient by giving her his personal cell phone number at her medical appointment 
with him.  
 
A penalty hearing is to be scheduled.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): August 21 to 23, 2017


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Jul 2015
Summary:

On July 17, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Javad Peirovy committed acts of 
professional misconduct in that:  he engaged in the sexual abuse of patients; he engaged in 
conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional; and, he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to 
practise. 
 
The Discipline Committee found that Dr. Peirovy sexually abused four patients, Ms. U, Ms. V, 
Ms. W, and Ms. X.  
 
Regarding Ms. U, the Committee found that Dr. Peirovy placed his stethoscope directly on her 
nipples and cupped her breasts with his hand, that he did not have consent to touch his patient in 
this manner and that there was no clinical reason to examine Ms. U in this way. The cupping of 
her breasts with his hand and the placing of the stethoscope directly on her nipples are actions 
which, to the objective observer, would be construed as sexual in nature. Regardless of Dr. 
Peirovy’s motivation, this deliberate touching of the nipples and breasts during a chest 
examination was a violation of Ms. U’s sexual integrity and constitutes sexual abuse.  
Regarding Ms. V, the Committee found that Dr. Peirovy placed his stethoscope directly on her 
nipples during the course of his examination, that he did not have consent to touch his patient in 
this manner and that there was no clinical reason to examine Ms. V in this way. The placing of 
the stethoscope directly on her nipples would, to the objective observer, be construed as sexual in 
nature. Regardless of Dr. Peirovy’s motivation, this deliberate touching of her nipples during a 
chest examination was a violation of Ms. V sexual integrity and constitutes sexual abuse. 
 
Regarding Ms. W, the Committee found that Dr. Peirovy touched her nipples with his fingers 
during the course of his examination, that Dr. Peirovy did not have consent to touch his patient in 
this manner and that there was no clinical reason to examine Ms. W in this way. The touching of 
her nipples, to the objective observer, would be construed as sexual in nature. Regardless of Dr. 
Peirovy’s motivation, the deliberate touching of her nipples during a chest examination was a 
violation of Ms. W’s sexual integrity and constitutes sexual abuse. 
 
Regarding Ms. X, the Committee found that during the course of his examination Dr. Peirovy 
cupped her breasts and used his fingers to put pressure on her nipples, which she described as 
“tweaking”, that Dr. Peirovy did not have consent to touch his patient in this manner and that 
there was no clinical reason to examine Ms. X in this way. The cupping of her breasts with his 
hand and “tweaking” of her nipples are actions which, to the objective observer, would be 
construed as sexual in nature. Regardless of Dr. Peirovy’s motivation, the deliberate touching of 
her breasts and nipples during a chest examination was a violation of Ms. X’s sexual integrity. 
 
The Committee found that Dr. Peirovy’s conduct with respect to these four patients, Ms. U, Ms. 
V, Ms. W, and Ms. X, would also reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable, or unprofessional. 
 
Regarding a fifth patient, Ms. Z, Dr. Peirovy conducted a cardiac examination during which Ms. 
Z’s breasts were left fully exposed due to a miscommunication between Dr. Peirovy and Ms. Z. 
The Committee stated it was Dr. Peirovy’s responsibility as the physician to take steps to ensure 
effective communication with respect to a sensitive examination of this nature and that he did not 
discharge this responsibility effectively. Further, when Dr. Peirovy realized that Ms. Z’s breasts 
were fully exposed, his decision to proceed with the examination without offering her privacy, 
by way of a gown for example, was a serious lapse of judgment. Regardless of time constraints 
or other issues, Dr. Peirovy should have recognized the vulnerable and compromised situation of 
Ms. Z, and responded in a more professional manner by assisting in preserving her modesty. The 
Committee found his conduct in this regard unprofessional. Following the examination, Dr. 
Peirovy engaged Ms. Z in conversation which culminated in asking her out on a date. He told her 
that she would have to sign a note for her chart terminating the doctor/patient relationship, if they 
were to see each other outside the office. Dr. Peirovy demonstrated egregiously poor judgment in 
suggesting to Ms. Z that they could see each other socially, in the context of just having 
compromised her privacy due to the ill-advised fashion in which he had examined her. The 
Committee found this conduct would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Peirovy has been found guilty of offences relevant 
to his suitability to practise in that he was found guilty of assault on Ms. U and Ms. W. The 
Court imposed a conditional discharge and eighteen months’ probation, with conditions 
including that Dr. Peirovy attend counselling with Dr. D, perform community service, make a 
charitable donation, and have no contact with the six complainants in these proceedings. 
PENALTY AND COSTS 
On April 27, 2016, The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Peirovy’s certificate of registration for a period of six months, 
   effective as of the date of this order at 11:59 pm. 
       
2. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitation of Dr. Peirovy’s 
   certificate of registration: 
 
Practice Monitor 
   a) Dr. Peirovy shall not engage in any professional encounters with female patients of any 
      age unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a female 
      member of a regulated health profession and who is acceptable to the College (the 
      “Practice Monitor”), to be reconsidered upon application to the Committee by Dr. 
      Peirovy after a minimum of one year following his return to practice once his suspension 
      has ended; 
       
   b) At all times, Dr. Peirovy shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall: 
       i.   Remain in the examination room or consultation room at all times during all 
            professional encounters with all female patients, even if another person is 
            accompanying the patient;  
       ii.  Carefully observe all of his physical examinations (including but not limited to 
            breast and chest examinations) of all female patients, with an unobstructed view 
            of the examination;  
      iii.  Refrain from performing any other functions, except those required in the Practice 
            Monitor’s undertaking attached as Appendix “A” (the “Practice Monitor’s 
            Undertaking”), while observing him in all his professional encounters with female 
            patients; 
      iv.   Keep a patient log in the form attached as Appendix “B” to this Order of all the 
            female patients with whom Dr. Peirovy has an in-person professional encounter in 
            the Practice Monitor’s presence (the “Log”); 
       v.   Initial the corresponding entry in the records of each patient noted in the Log to 
            confirm that the Practice Monitor was in the presence of Dr. Peirovy at all times 
            during each female in-person professional encounter; 
      vi.   Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis; and 
      vii.  Provide reports (as described in the Practice Monitor’s Undertaking) to the 
            College on at least a monthly basis.  
   c) Dr. Peirovy shall maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and shall make it available to 
      the College upon request; 
       
Notification of Practice Locations  
   d) Dr. Peirovy shall inform the College of each and every location that he practices 
      including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction 
      (collectively the “Practice Location(s)”), within fifteen (15) days of this Order. Going 
      forward, he shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen 
      (15) days of commencing practice at that location;  
 
Posting a Sign  
   e) Dr. Peirovy shall post a sign in his waiting room(s) and each of his examination and/or 
      consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, 
      in the form attached hereto as Appendix “C”;  
   f) Dr. Peirovy shall provide patients with a guide to access the Discipline Committee’s 
      decision in this matter, if requested; 
 
Monitoring  
   g) Dr. Peirovy shall consent to the College making appropriate enquiries of the Ontario 
      Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who may have relevant 
      information in order for the College to monitor Dr. Peirovy’s compliance with the terms 
      of this Order and shall promptly sign such consents as may be necessary for the College 
      to obtain information from these persons or institutions; 
   h) Dr. Peirovy shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his 
      Practice Locations and to inspections of patient charts by the College and to any other 
      activity the College deems necessary, including simulated patients, in order to monitor 
      Dr. Peirovy’s compliance with the terms of this Order; 
   i) Dr. Peirovy shall consent to the College providing any and all information to the Practice 
      Monitor that the College deems necessary or desirable in order to assist the Practice 
      Monitor in fulfilling her Undertaking and in order to monitor Dr. Peirovy’s compliance 
      with the terms of this Order; and 
   j) Dr. Peirovy shall consent to all Practice Monitors disclosing to the College, and to one 
      another, any information relevant to this Order, relevant to the terms of the Practice 
      Monitor’s Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring Dr. Peirovy’s 
      compliance with this Order; 
       
Individualized Instruction  
   k) Dr. Peirovy continue to undergo individualized instruction with Dr. D on issues of 
      consent, the maintenance of boundaries, and doctor/patient communication, and that Dr. 
      D report to the College on Dr. Peirovy’s progress each six months, with a final report to 
      follow prior to her termination of instruction with Dr. Peirovy. Termination of the 
      individualized instruction shall be at the discretion of Dr. D; 
 
Clinical Education Program 
   l) Dr. Peirovy shall, within 90 days of the commencement of the suspension of his 
      certificate of registration, meet with a physician advisor from the College to establish a 
      clinical education program, directed by a supervisor acceptable to the College, regarding 
      the issue of physical examination, with particular focus on issues of the sexual privacy of 
      and sensitivity to female patients. 
   m) All the above terms and conditions to be at Dr. Peirovy’s expense. 
 
3. Dr. Peirovy reimburse the College for funding for patients therapy, pursuant to the program 
   required under section 85.7 of the Code, and that he post an irrevocable letter of credit or 
   other security acceptable to the College to guarantee payment, in the amount of $64,240.00. 
    
4. Dr. Peirovy appear before the Committee to be reprimanded, not later than six months from 
   the date this Order becomes final. 
 
5. Dr. Peirovy pay costs to the College in the amount of $35,680.00 within sixty (60) days of 
   the date of this Order. 
 
6. In light of the fact that this Order is different form the penalty proposed by either party, the 
   parties have ten days from the date of this Order to make written submissions with respect to 
   any issues related to the implementation of this Order.  To be clear, the Panel is not inviting 
   submissions with respect to the substance of this Order or the start date of the period of 
   suspension, but simply wishes to provide the parties with an opportunity to address any 
   potential difficulties with the implementation of this Order which may not have been 
   apparent to the Committee.   
 
APPEALS 
On August 7, 2015, Dr. Peirovy appealed the decision on finding of the Discipline Committee to 
the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). 

On May 24, 2016, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario appealed the decision on 
penalty of the Discipline Committee to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). 

On June 27, 2016, Dr. Peirovy abandoned his appeal to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional 
Court). 

On January 17, 2017, the Divisional Court granted the College’s appeal of the penalty decision, 
quashed the penalty imposed and remitted the matter to the Discipline Committee to impose a 
penalty. Pending the disposition of penalty by the Discipline Committee Dr. Peirovy’s 
undertaking of July 23, 2013, signed in lieu of a s.37 order and consenting to practice 
restrictions, came back into effect. 
 
On January 30, 2017, Dr. Peirovy filed a motion for leave to appeal the decision of the 
Divisional Court to the Court of Appeal and for an order staying the decision of the Divisional 
Court pending leave, and if leave is granted, pending the disposition of the appeal. 

On April 13, 2017, the Court of Appeal granted Dr. Peirovy’s motion for leave to appeal. Upon 
leave being granted by the Court of Appeal, the College consented to the adjournment of the 
scheduled penalty hearing of September 6 and 7, 2017, until such time as the appeal was 
determined. 
On August 30, 2017, Dr. Peirovy entered into a supplemental undertaking agreeing to only 
engage in professional encounters at his practice at 298 Sheppard Avenue East, Toronto, in 
“Exam Room 1”. 
 
On May 3, 2018, the Court of Appeal allowed Dr. Peirovy’s appeal of the Divisional Court 
decision and restored the decision of the Discipline Committee. Therefore, the decision of the 
Discipline Committee is in effect.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Notice of Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 12-16, January 27, 2015. Penalty hearing date October 26 and 30, 2015, New Penalty Hearing Dates: September 6-7, 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 30, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Javad Peirovy to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 30, 2017:

Dr. Peirovy will only engage in professional encounters at his practice at 298 Sheppard Avenue East, Toronto, in “Exam Room 1”.