Javanmard, Mahan (CPSO#: 78014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 WILSON AVE
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mahan Javanmard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Javanmard ( CPSO# 78014 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Weston ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHAN JAVANMARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAVANMARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004