Jean-St-Michel, Emilie Melissa (CPSO#: 86491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Cardiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Renaud Dutrisac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dutrisac ( CPSO# 94894 )
Dr. E. Jean-St-Michel ( CPSO# 86491 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6453

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILIE MELISSA JEAN-ST-MICHEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEAN-ST-MICHEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2011