Jedrzkiewicz, Sean Jerry (CPSO#: 79076)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone: (905) 849-4567
Fax: (905) 849-4566
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 340
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Canada
Phone: (905) 849-4567 Ext. 2
Fax: 905-849-4566
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 409
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Canada
Phone: 905-849-4567 Ext. 2
Fax: 905-849-4566
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Jedrzkiewicz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jedrzkiewicz ( CPSO# 79076 )

Business Address:
Suite 340
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Business Address:
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 409
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Business Address:
Suite 300
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN JERRY JEDRZKIEWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEDRZKIEWICZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008