Jeejeebhoy, Khursheed Nowrojee (CPSO#: 23113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Madras, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Champagne Drive
Suite B19
Champagne Centre
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 645-5145
Fax: (416) 645-1401
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

164 Queen Street East Suite 209
Brampton ON  L6W 4L2
Canada
Phone: 905-451-7540
Fax: 905-451-4743
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

726 Upper James St.
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: 905-575-5743
Fax: 905-575-7711
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khursheed Jeejeebhoy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Jeejeebhoy ( CPSO# 23113 )

Business Address:
209-164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 4L2
Phone Number: (905) 451-7540

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Business Address:
Suite B19
2 Champagne Drive
North York ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 645-5145

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHURSHEED NOWROJEE JEEJEEBHOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEEJEEBHOY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1970