Jeyanathan, Tasha Radha (CPSO#: 91343)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Humber college blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-747-3400
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Kandasamy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kandasamy ( CPSO# 88451 )
Dr. T. Jeyanathan ( CPSO# 91343 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4138

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
Suite 402
685 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 1B6
Phone Number: (416) 499-5558

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TASHA RADHA JEYANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEYANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2013