Jeyaraj, Leo Muthusamy (CPSO#: 81918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Madurai Kamaraj University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Dept of Anesthesiology and Pain Med
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19538
Fax: (613) 761-5209
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

OGI Endoscopy
1910 St. Laurent Blvd - Unit 29
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: (613)686-6656
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Revisage Surgical centre
1655 Kilborn Avenue,
Ottawa ON  K1H 6M7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Argyle Associates
100 - 2255 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7Z5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.M. Jeyaraj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jeyaraj ( CPSO# 81918 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4576

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Sep 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Sep 2004 to 17 Oct 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 18 Oct 2004 to 16 Sep 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Oct 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Leo   Muthusamy   Jeyaraj   may   practise   medicine   independently  in
            Anaesthesiology.