Jiang, Ming Yi (CPSO#: 97692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Fuzhou, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 4162421000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ming Yi Jiang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jiang ( CPSO# 97692 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MING YI JIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017