Jin, Albert Yongwon (CPSO#: 76075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Neurology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 2605
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Albert Jin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jin ( CPSO# 76075 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Neurology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBERT YONGWON JIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2008