Jin, Fengling (CPSO#: 77414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Beijing Medical University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6290
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Jin ( CPSO# 77414 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 620-4575

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FENGLING JIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2002 to 31 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 04 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008