Jindal, Nina (CPSO#: 91907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: Lakhani, Nina (used until: 03 Dec 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-3056
Fax: 416-864-6046
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

202 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1R2
Canada
Phone: (416) 944-8333
Fax: (416) 944-1582
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 630
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (647) 427-6001
Fax: (416) 598-4659
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Danforth Medical Centre
880 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1K 1H8
Canada
Phone: (416) 264-4848
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 350-5900
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 301
294 Main Street
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 693-3030
Fax: (416) 693-3033
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nina Jindal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jindal ( CPSO# 91907 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
4CC Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3056

Business Address:
880 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1K 1H8
Phone Number: (416) 264-4848

Business Address:
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Business Address:
202 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1R2
Phone Number: (416) 944-8333

Business Address:
Unit 301
294 Main Street
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Phone Number: (416) 693-3030

Business Address:
Unit 630
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (647) 427-6001

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 27 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NINA JINDAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JINDAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2009 to 26 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 27 Oct 2009 to 03 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2010 to 03 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2011 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2013