Johnson, Kim Cheng (CPSO#: 82566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Health Care Centre
Richmond Adelaide Centre Concourse
PO Box 92
130 Adelaide Street West
Toronto ON  M5H 3P5
Phone: (416) 361-6142
Fax: (416) 361-1200
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Ma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ma ( CPSO# 78067 )
Dr. K. Johnson ( CPSO# 82566 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
3-EN
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3242

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9

Business Address:
Suite 11 - 15
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1

Business Address:
4-66 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 3N8

Business Address:
1401 - 123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIM CHENG JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2007