Johnson, Sindhu Rose (CPSO#: 72469)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Rheumatology
Toronto Western Hospital
Ground Floor East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6417
Fax: (416) 603-4348
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scleroderma Clinic
Mount Sinai Hospital
2nd Floor, Joseph & Wolf Lebovic Bl
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-8549
Fax: (416) 586-8766
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wijeysundera Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wijeysundera ( CPSO# 72422 )
Dr. S. Johnson ( CPSO# 72469 )

Business Address:
Uhn - Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Suite 3-450, Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
Ground Floor, East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6417

Business Address:
60 Murray Street
Suite 2-0009
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SINDHU ROSE JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2002