Johnson, Taylor Alexander (CPSO#: 98063)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
Emergency Department
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 352-6400
Fax: (519) 352-8002
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stratford General Hospital
Emergency Department
46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (519) 272-8210
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.A. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Johnson ( CPSO# 98063 )
Dr. A. Johnson ( CPSO# 98043 )

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
3-59 King Street West
Forest ON  N0N 1J0
Phone Number: (519) 786-4545

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAYLOR ALEXANDER JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2014