Johnson, William Samuel (CPSO#: 81231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105 - 10 Cotrelle Blvd
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone: (905) 497-2255
Fax: (905) 497-2261
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Johnson ( CPSO# 81231 )
Dr. J. Rackal ( CPSO# 81395 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
1370 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4
Phone Number: (905) 949-4488

Business Address:
105 - 10 Cotrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 497-2255

Business Address:
520 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 427-2255

Business Address:
178 John Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2A4
Phone Number: (905) 455-4414

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 25 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM SAMUEL JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012