Jolly, Shivinder Singh (CPSO#: 68788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone: (519) 743-2573
Fax: (519) 743-2792
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shivinder S. Jolly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jolly ( CPSO# 68788 )

Business Address:
104 - 18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone Number: (519) 743-2573

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIVINDER SINGH JOLLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOLLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1999