Jones, Allen Sohrab (CPSO#: 79923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Clinic
200 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1H3
Phone: (905) 523-4567
Fax: (905) 523-4533
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Caledonia Clinic
53 Argyle Street
Caledonia ON  N3W 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 765-5885
Fax: (905) 765-7887
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Entourage Clinic
1447 Upper Ottawa
Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Canada
Phone: (905) 645-0520
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.S. Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jones ( CPSO# 79923 )

Business Address:
Caledonia Clinic
53 Argyle Street
Caledonia ON  N3W 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 765-5885

Business Address:
Hamilton Clinic
200 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1H3
Phone Number: (905) 523-4567

Business Address:
Brantford Clinic
203 Colborne Street
Brantford ON  N3T 2G8
Phone Number: (519) 758-5800

Business Address:
Entourage Clinic
1447 Upper Ottawa Street
Unit 4
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 645-0520

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLEN SOHRAB JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 14 Apr 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2006