Jones, David Alexander Rhys (CPSO#: 77636)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville, Ontario
K0G 1J0
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-6133
Fax: (613) 258-4997
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jones ( CPSO# 77636 )

Business Address:
KDH Health Centre
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ALEXANDER RHYS JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2005