Jones, Jennifer Lynne (CPSO#: 95132)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Centre for Family Medicine
3742 Nafziger Road
Wellesley ON  N0B 2T0
Phone: (519) 656-2220
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. L. Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jones ( CPSO# 95132 )

Business Address:
The Centre for Family Medicine
Wellesley Site
3742 Nafziger Road
Wellesley ON  N0B 2T0
Phone Number: (519) 656-2220

Business Address:
The Centre for Family Medicine
Integrated Health Building Site
10 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 783-0020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNNE JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013