Jones, Jeremy Christopher (CPSO#: 76233)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203a, Kent Place
189 Kent St West
Lindsay ON  K9V 5G6
Phone: (705) 878-4004
Fax: (705) 878-1822
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeremy Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jones ( CPSO# 76233 )

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (905) 324-6111

Business Address:
Suite 203A
189 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON  K9V 5G6
Phone Number: (705) 878-4004

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY CHRISTOPHER JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005