Jones, Nicole Alicia (CPSO#: 82595)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Durham Family Health Team
1105 Kingston Road
Building E, Suite 200B
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 420-9999
Fax: (905) 420-1090
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rene Goupil Jesuits
2315 Liverpool Road
Pickering ON  L1X 1V4
Canada
Phone: 905-839-5151
Fax: 905-839-5556
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Providence Healthcare
3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Canada
Phone: 416-285-3666
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N.A. Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jones ( CPSO# 82595 )

Business Address:
1105 Kingston Road
Building E Suite 200B
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 420-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE ALICIA JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007