Josan, Kiranbir (CPSO#: 97337)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K Josan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 15 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Royal Victoria Hospital 201 Georgian Drive Barrie ON L4M 6M2 Cardio Study Suite 401 8333 Weston Road Woodbridge ON L4L 6M2 PACE Cardiology Suite 302 11 Lakeside Terrace Barrie ON L4M 0H9
Date Received: 03 Jun 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016