Joseph, Marissa Olubukola (CPSO#: 80897)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
RKS Dermatology Centre
5th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone: (416) 323-7546
Fax: (416) 323-6236
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

45 Mill Street
Toronto ON  M5A 3R6
Canada
Phone: 4168693376
Fax: 4163657546
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

586 Eglinton Ave
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Canada
Phone: 416-489-3273
Fax: (416) 489-1510
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Section of Dermatology
Department of Pediatrics
The Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-8185
Fax: (416) 813-7909
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marissa Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Joseph ( CPSO# 80897 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
RKS Dermatology Centre
5th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 323-7546

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-8185

Business Address:
Suite 404
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 489-3273

Business Address:
45 Mill Street
Toronto ON  M5A 3R6
Phone Number: (416) 869-3376

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARISSA OLUBUKOLA JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008