Joshi, Supriya (CPSO#: 72227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 509
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 569-9546
Fax: (905) 569-9987
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Supriya Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Joshi ( CPSO# 72227 )

Business Address:
Suite 509
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 569-9546

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUPRIYA JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002