Josseau, Melanie Jeanne Christiane (CPSO#: 90988)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Arnprior and District Memorial
Hospital
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Josseau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Josseau ( CPSO# 90988 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-4710

Business Address:
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE JEANNE CHRISTIANE JOSSEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSSEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2011