Juta, Dhanesh (CPSO#: 83817)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Zulu

Education:Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3-1050 Upper Gage Ave
Hamilton ON  L8V 5B7
Phone: (905) 575-1114
Fax: (905) 575-8601
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Juta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Juta ( CPSO# 83817 )

Business Address:
3-1050 Upper Gage Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8V 5B7
Phone Number: (905) 575-1114

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DHANESH JUTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUTA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Oct 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2005