Juta, Manikant Maganlall (CPSO#: 92572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Bombay, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jack Nathan Health Clinic
675 Upper James St
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z5
Phone: (905) 768-4400
Fax: (905) 575-0760
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manikant M. Juta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Juta ( CPSO# 92572 )

Business Address:
Jack Nathan Health Clinic
675 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z5
Phone Number: (905) 768-4400

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 17 Oct 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 17 Oct 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 17, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Manikant Maganlall
            Juta, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Juta to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                      DR. MANIKANT MAGANLALL JUTA
                                             ("Dr. Juta")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")




            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "IEP" means individualized education plan;
                  
                  "Medical Inspectors' Reports" means the reports of the medical inspector
                  and independent opinion provider received by the College January 2, 2014;
                  March 4, 2014; November 4, 2014; February 27, 2015; and March 29, 2016;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "public register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Juta, certificate of registration number 92572, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge that the College initiated investigations into
                  my long term care practice and family practice bearing File Numbers
                  7214011 and 7214866 (the "Investigations") and clinical deficiencies have
                  been identified. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Juta, undertake that, effective immediately, I will cease to
                        engage in long term care practice.
                  
            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Juta, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"),
                        as outlined in the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking attached
                        hereto as Appendix "A", the IEP attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        and as set out below: 
                  
                        (i)   High Level Supervision
                  
                              1.    I, Dr. Juta, undertake that initially I will practise
                                    under the high level supervision of the Clinical
                                    Supervisor ("High Level Supervision"). 
                  
                              2.    I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge that during the period of High
                                    Level Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor will be the
                                    most responsible physician.
                  
                              3.    I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge that during the period of High
                                    Level Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor will be
                                    present on site for regular observation and discussion
                                    of at least five (5) cases on each work day with a
                                    review of corresponding medical records.
                  
                              4.    I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge that during the period of High
                                    Level Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor will review
                                    and sign off on the records of all patients seen by me.
                  
                        (ii)  Moderate Level Supervision
                  
                              1.    I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge that if, after a minimum of
                                    one (1) month of High Level Supervision, my Clinical
                                    Supervisor reports to the College that satisfactory
                                    progress has been made during the period of High Level
                                    Supervision, the College may, in its discretion, reduce
                                    the degree of supervision to a moderate level
                                    ("Moderate Level Supervision"). 
                  
                              2.    I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge that during the period of
                                    Moderate Level Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor
                                    will meet with me  at least weekly to review at least
                                    ten (10) of my patient charts.
                  
                        (iii) Low Level Supervision
                  
                              1.    I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge that if, after a minimum of
                                    three (3) months of Moderate Level Supervision, my
                                    Clinical Supervisor reports to the College that
                                    satisfactory progress has been made during the period
                                    of Moderate Level Supervision, the College may, in its
                                    discretion, reduce the degree of supervision to a low
                                    level ("Low Level Supervision").
                  
                              2.    I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge that during the period of Low
                                    Level Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor will meet
                                    with me at least monthly to review at least ten (10) of
                                    my patient charts.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor will, at
                        minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the IEP attached
                              hereto as Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Select the charts to review based on the educational needs
                              identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                              Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in
                              the Medical Inspectors' Reports, and concerns that may arise
                              during the period of Clinical Supervision;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Juta, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Juta, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Juta, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Juta, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Juta, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Juta, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   a program satisfactory to the College in medical record
                              keeping; 
                  
                        (ii)  a program satisfactory to the College in ethics;
                  
                        (iii) all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (iv)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Juta, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (7)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (7)(a).
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Juta, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Juta, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Juta, understand and agree that if I am of the view that any
                        of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR Committee
                        will consider my submissions and make a determination regarding
                        whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable
                        and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Juta, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Juta, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (8)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Juta, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Juta, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Juta, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Juta, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the public register during the time period that
                  the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (15)  I, Dr. Juta, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  public register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in
                  effect:

                        Dr. Juta was the subject of College investigations into his long
                        term care practice and family practice, and clinical deficiencies
                        have been identified. As a result of the investigation:
                        *     Dr. Juta will cease to engage in long term care practice.
                        *     Dr. Juta will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                        *     Dr. Juta will engage in professional education in medical
                              recordkeeping.
                        *     Dr. Juta's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Juta, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (7) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Juta, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Juta, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates my
                  completion of the professional education set out in section (7) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (7) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Manikant Maganlall Juta to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 17, 2016:

Dr. Juta was the subject of College investigations into his long term care practice and family practice, and clinical deficiencies have been identified. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Juta will cease to engage in long term care practice.
• Dr. Juta will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.
• Dr. Juta will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping.
• Dr. Juta’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.