Juvet, Stephen Charles (CPSO#: 77940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Room 11 PMB 126
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 8178
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Juvet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Juvet ( CPSO# 77940 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Room 11PMB126
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 11 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN CHARLES JUVET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUVET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006