Nia, Keon Motamedi (CPSO#: 79584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Nia, Jon Motamedi (used until: 15 Jun 2005 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
125 Steamship Bay Road
Gravenhurst ON  P1P 1Z9
Phone: (705) 687-9520
Fax: (888) 314-7353
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2235 sheppard avenue suite 101
Toronto ON  M2J 5B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 492-7257
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

5025 Orbitor Dr #3
Mississauga ON  L4W 4Y5
Canada
Phone: (416) 362-8677
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

100 King St. West #120
Toronto ON  M5X 2A1
Canada
Phone: (416) 362-8677
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Keon M. Nia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nia ( CPSO# 79584 )

Business Address:
2235 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2J 5B5
Phone Number: (416) 362-8677

Business Address:
2 - 125 Steamship Bay Road
Gravenhurst ON  P1P 1Z9
Phone Number: (705) 687-9520

Business Address:
Suite 3
5025 Orbitor Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 4Y5
Phone Number: (416) 362-8677

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEON MOTAMEDI NIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008